MD HB259 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reorganizing State government by establishing Bowie State University, Coppin State University, and University of Maryland Eastern Shore as independent universities; prohibiting the inclusion of Bowie State University, Coppin State University, and University of Maryland Eastern Shore within the University System of Maryland; designating certain historically black colleges and universities as certain entities; providing that certain historically black colleges and universities have certain responsibilities; etc.
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Independence From University System of Maryland
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-08-31 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Curriculum
Demographics
Elections
Health
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
meetings
Minorities
Public Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Traffic Regulation
Tuition
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Curriculum
Demographics
Elections
Health
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
meetings
Minorities
Public Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Traffic Regulation
Tuition
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 12 | 101.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 713 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |