MD HB263 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a judicial officer to consider the recommendation of a certain pretrial release services program in making a certain determination; requiring a court or District Court commissioner to consider including certain no-contact provisions as a condition of pretrial release if a certain pretrial release services program has made a certain request; requiring a certain pretrial release services program to notify the court on receipt of certain information; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Electronic Communication
Hearings
Howard County
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Notices
Pretrial Detention or Release
Privacy
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
St. Mary's County
Victims
Warrants
Correctional Officers
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Electronic Communication
Hearings
Howard County
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Notices
Pretrial Detention or Release
Privacy
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
St. Mary's County
Victims
Warrants