MD HB265 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing an individual to resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System if the individual has been separated from employment and has accrued a certain amount of eligibility service; providing for the retroactive application of the Act; requiring certain service credit earned in the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit to be credited to the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback