MD HB267 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to monitor effluent discharged from sewage treatment plants and evaluate whether the effluent impacts midge populations in the surrounding land and water areas; and requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before October 1 each year, beginning in 2022.
Title
Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {210317/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-09-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB267 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 321.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |