MD HB268 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Defining "local promise scholarship" as a community college scholarship program in effect on July 1, 2018, that provides a scholarship to any high school senior who is eligible for enrollment at the community college; and specifying that if an award recipient is eligible for a local promise scholarship, an award under the Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship program shall be credited to the tuition of a scholarship recipient before the award of a local promise scholarship; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (43-1)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {904564/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback