MD HB268 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to repeal the requirement that a candidate for Governor who seeks nomination in a primary election designate a candidate for Lieutenant Governor at the time of filing a certificate of candidacy; requiring a candidate for Governor who seeks nomination in a primary election to designate a candidate for Lieutenant Governor within 21 days after the primary election; submitting this amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-41) |
2020-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB268 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Ballots
Constitutional Amendments
Elections
Governor
Lieutenant Governor
Political Candidates
Referendum
Time
Constitutional Amendments
Elections
Governor
Lieutenant Governor
Political Candidates
Referendum
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
II - Executive Department | 1B | (n/a) | See Bill Text |