MD HB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the establishment of law enforcement diversion programs in partnership with local behavioral health authorities; authorizing the participation of certain individuals; authorizing certain providers to provide case management including peer recovery support approaches; requiring certain planning for the implementation of certain programs; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to submit a report on the number of law enforcement encounters resulting in a behavioral health services referral; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {622519/1 Adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-09-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Data
Health, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services
State's Attorneys
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Data
Health, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services
State's Attorneys
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 4 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |