MD HB272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a person that is subject to the Forest Conservation Act to demonstrate that appropriate credits generated by a forest mitigation bank in the same county or watershed are not available before the person may pay money to a State or local forest conservation fund to meet certain requirements; prohibiting a local authority from collecting money for deposit into its forest conservation fund unless it has submitted to the Department of Naural Resources the mitigation plan and accounting procedures; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-17) (Y: 123 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (122-17)
2019-03-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {900515/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback