MD HB272 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certain mitigating factor in a certain juvenile court proceeding against a child for a certain violation; requiring and authorizing the juvenile court to take certain actions in making a certain disposition on a certain finding; prohibiting the juvenile court from taking certain actions in making a certain disposition on a certain finding; establishing that a child who is found by the juvenile court to have violated a certain provision of law is not subject to certain sex offender registration; etc.
Title
Juveniles – Sexting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {802516/2 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Education
Electronic Communication
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Mobile Devices
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Obscenity
Penalties and Sentences
Pornography
Registration
Sexual Offenses
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Education
Electronic Communication
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Mobile Devices
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Obscenity
Penalties and Sentences
Pornography
Registration
Sexual Offenses
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |