MD HB277 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Governor to include the State as a full participant in a regional governmental initiative, agreement, or compact that limits or reduces greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation sector; requiring the Department of the Environment and the Department of Transportation to submit a report on the status of any regional initiative, agreement or compact that limits or reduces greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation sector to the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-35) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (99-35)
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {410115/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-04HouseReassigned to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback