MD HB279 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB193
Note: Carry Over of previous HB23
Note: Carry Over of previous HB23
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for golf carts on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, or Taylors Island in Dorchester County; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, or Taylors Island may operate the golf cart only on highways on which the maximum speed does not exceed 30 miles per hour between dawn and dusk and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB279 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
SB312 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Referred Environment and Transportation
HB23 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
SB312 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Referred Environment and Transportation
HB23 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Boundaries
Dorchester County
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Dorchester County
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 104.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0279?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0279f.pdf |