MD HB281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring county boards to require public high schools to offer at least one high-quality computer science course beginning in the 2021-2022 school year; establishing the Maryland Center for Computing Education to identify ways to expand access to high-quality computer science education, strengthen the skills of educators, and increase the number of computer science teachers; requiring the Center to work with certain institutions of higher education; etc.
Title
Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment {884035/1 Withdrawn |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington, and Afzali |
2018-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884035/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {285465/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counties
Curriculum
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counties
Curriculum
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology