MD HB281 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the crime of adultery.
Title
Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-35) (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-35) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |