MD HB281 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1537
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a new officer of a humane society or animal control to receive at least 80 hours of training within the first 12 months of employment; requiring an officer of a humane society or animal control to complete at least 6 hours of continuing education every year; requiring the training and continuing education to include instruction on current laws applicable to officers; and authorizing the appropriate unit of a county or municipality to require training in addition to that which is specified in the Act.
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Mark Chang [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {448074/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2021-02-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {880112/1 Adopted |
2021-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-05 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB159 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
HB1537 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1537 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Abuse
Animal Shelters
Animals
Civil Actions
Continuing Education
Courts
Diseases
Domestic Violence
Ethics
Evidence
Health
Job Training
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Mental and Behavioral Health
Search and Seizure
Trials
Animal Shelters
Animals
Civil Actions
Continuing Education
Courts
Diseases
Domestic Violence
Ethics
Evidence
Health
Job Training
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Mental and Behavioral Health
Search and Seizure
Trials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |