MD HB283 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services employees in certain positions on or after July 1, 2019; requiring a certain transfer and combination of certain service credit for certain individuals; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to calculate a certain disability benefit for certain individuals and to grant a certain benefit under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Data
Health Insurance
Notices
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Data
Health Insurance
Notices
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement