MD HB283 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the appointed members of the Harford County Board of Education to be appointed within 90 days of the general election beginning in November 2024; and providing for the termination of the terms of certain appointed members of the county board.
Title
Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-10-27 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB382 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-03 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0283?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0283f.pdf |