MD HB285 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to publish a meeting agenda not less than 1 week before a meeting; requiring the Board to broadcast via live stream every open meeting online; altering the timing requirement for publication of meeting minutes to not later than 1 month after a meeting; and requiring the Board to archive and store recordings of each open meeting for not less than 3 years and records of minutes for each open meeting for not less than 7 years.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 152 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {924732/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {473991/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB163 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 153
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
internet
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Open Government
Publications
Records
Time
Video
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
internet
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Open Government
Publications
Records
Time
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |