MD HB285 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1324
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting; requiring the Workgroup to examine the processes used to collect and report statewide vehicle crash data for injuries and fatalities, examine the categories into which the data is disaggregated and reported, and determine the most effective manner for the State to begin to collect, disaggregate, and report the data by race and ethnicity; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1324 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Data
Death
Demographics
Injury
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Data
Death
Demographics
Injury
Investigations and Inquiries
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0285?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0285f.pdf |