MD HB291 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB617
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to issue a Class A beer and light wine license for use in a supermarket that has a minimum investment of at least $500,000 in the supermarket facilities, not including the cost of land or buildings.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 308-20
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB291 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Investments
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Investments
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0291?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0291f.pdf |