MD HB292 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding to all counties in the State a prohibition on State agencies constructing within the nine Eastern Shore counties a toll road, toll highway, or toll bridge without the consent of a majority of the affected counties.
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB229 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bridges and Tunnels
Communications
Construction
Counties
Fees
Highways
Transportation - Highways
Voting
Bridges and Tunnels
Communications
Construction
Counties
Fees
Highways
Transportation - Highways
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 4 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |