MD HB293 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a volunteer fire company or volunteer ambulance company alcoholic beverages license in Frederick County; specifying that the license authorizes a volunteer fire company or volunteer ambulance company to sell beer, wine, and liquor only during a fund-raising event for on-premises consumption; requiring the license holder to provide a certain notice to the Board of License Commissioners at least 14 days before the event is to be held; and setting a $500 annual license fee.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Company or Volunteer Ambulance Company License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Ambulances
Fees
Fire Protection
Frederick County
Notices
Volunteers
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Ambulances
Fees
Fire Protection
Frederick County
Notices
Volunteers