MD HB294 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to 2 a.m. the time when the entertainment provided by a holder of a family entertainment permit in Prince George's County must end.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit PG 304-20
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Licenses
Prince George's County
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Licenses
Prince George's County
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0294?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0294f.pdf |