MD HB297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County to issue a catering extension to the holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license; providing that a catering extension authorizes a holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license to provide alcoholic beverages at an event that is held off the premises under certain circumstances and only during certain times and days; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Catering Extension MC 27-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 156 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Rules and Regulations
Special Events
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Rules and Regulations
Special Events
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |