MD HB301 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date on provisions of law related to policy and reporting requirements for race-based traffic stops; requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, on or before September 1 each year, to post on its website, in a manner easily accessible to the public, a filterable data display showing certain traffic stop data for the previous calendar year; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide electronic and written notice to the General Assembly when the filterable data display is updated.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senators Carter, Washington, and West |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-04 | House | Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love, and Bridges |
2019-04-04 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-04 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-04 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {448576/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {180610/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Data
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
internet
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Data
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
internet
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous