MD HB305 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the assessment fee payable by specified domestic reinsurers to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; exempting the domestic reinsurers from a requirement to have an office in the State; requiring the domestic reinsurers to keep specified assets in the State; and authorizing the domestic reinsurers to keep their general ledger accounting records outside the State under specified circumstances.
Title
Insurance - Domestic Reinsurers
Sponsors
Del. Emmett Burns [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Del. Mary Love [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Del. Herman Taylor [D] | Del. Michael Vaughn [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Economic Matters |