MD HB305 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that budgeting and finance procedures established by the County Commissioners of Carroll County provide that specified surplus funds of the County be included as revenue for the budget for the next fiscal year.
Title
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |