MD HB305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on private property in Kent County on Sundays during the spring turkey hunting season.
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-5) (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-5) (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-5) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |