MD HB305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force to investigate and study ways to increase the procurement of locally grown foods in State contracts and to promote participation by Maryland farmers in the process; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Procurement - Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback