MD HB309 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB771
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Frederick County, if the activity is directed at or organized by students with individualized education programs; and repealing an exception for a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Frederick County that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018.
Title
Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {145466/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB309 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB317 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Senate Requests House Recede
SB317 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Senate Requests House Recede
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Continuing Education
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education - Miscellaneous
Food
Frederick County
Job Training
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Continuing Education
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education - Miscellaneous
Food
Frederick County
Job Training
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations