MD HB316 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a health care provider who administers a vaccine or the agent of the health care provider in the State to report all vaccines administered to the Maryland immunization registry, ImmuNet, with certain exceptions; altering certain responsibilities of the Secretary of Health and the Maryland Department of Health relating to certain forms and a certain brochure regarding ImmuNet and vaccinations; etc.
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsors
Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] |
Sen. Nick Charles [D] | Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {266882/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assisted Living
Communications
Continuing Care
Education
Forms
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Immunization
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Notices
Nursing Homes
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Reports
Safety
Assisted Living
Communications
Continuing Care
Education
Forms
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Immunization
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Notices
Nursing Homes
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Reports
Safety