MD HB318 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each constituent institution of higher education in the University System of Maryland to develop a method to clearly and conspicuously show students in the online course catalog which courses use free or low cost digital materials and may provide access to certain low-cost print materials; and providing that certain free or low-cost digital materials include certain resources and be equally accessible and usable by individuals with disabilities.
Title
University System of Maryland – Textbooks – Availability of Free or Low–Cost Digital Materials
(Textbook Transparency Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 165 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {694868/1 Adopted |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB667 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 166
Subjects
Curriculum
Disabilities
Education
Electronic Communication
Higher Education
Prices
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Textbooks
Disabilities
Education
Electronic Communication
Higher Education
Prices
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Textbooks