MD HB32 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from basing a suspension or revocation of the registration of a vehicle on the vehicle owner's failure to have the vehicle inspected and tested as required under the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program.
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-07-03 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Pollution
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Motor Vehicle Registration
Pollution
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections