MD HB320 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "undue influence" for purposes of provisions of law prohibiting the exploitation of certain vulnerable adults or individuals at least 68 years old that results in inequity; requiring a court, in determining whether a transfer of property was induced by undue influence, to consider certain factors; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {132511/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB702 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys
Caregivers
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disabilities
Education
Elderly Persons
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Health
Health Occupations
Human Rights
Injury
Mental and Behavioral Health
Personal Property
Real Property
Victims
Vulnerable Adults
Caregivers
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disabilities
Education
Elderly Persons
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Health
Health Occupations
Human Rights
Injury
Mental and Behavioral Health
Personal Property
Real Property
Victims
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 8 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 11 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |