MD HB322 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain time and area restrictions on the consumption of beer, wine, and liquor in a cinema or theater for which a Class CT (cinema/theater) license has been issued in Frederick County; and authorizing the on-premises consumption of beer, wine, and liquor in the lobby or a screening room or performance hall in the licensed premises of the cinema or theater.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 167 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB612 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Frederick County
Licenses
Motion Pictures
Theaters
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Frederick County
Licenses
Motion Pictures
Theaters
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1003.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |