MD HB323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a County Commissioner from a commissioners' district to reside in that commissioners' district for the 6 months immediately preceding the filing deadline for the election of the Commissioner and during the full term of office of the Commissioner; prohibiting a Commissioner from a commissioners' district from continuing the current term if the Commissioner does not maintain residency in that commissioners' district under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195 |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-04-01 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {534630/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {990517/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Residency
Somerset County
Time
County Commissioners
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Residency
Somerset County
Time