MD HB329 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to study the role of occupation and educational level in policies of private passenger motor vehicle insurance; requiring the Administration to review certain matters as part of the study; and requiring the Administration to submit a final report on the study to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Economic Matters Committee by December 31, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {703594/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback