MD HB332 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Community Dental Clinics Grant Program; authorizing the Board of Public Works, on the recommendation of the Secretary of Health, to make grants under the Program to counties, municipal corporations, and nonprofit organizations for the purpose of supporting the provision of dental services by community dental clinics; requiring the Governor to include funding in the State operating budget bill or capital budget bill for the Program beginning in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {257470/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {536489/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0332&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0332f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0332t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0332e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_540_hb0332e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0332_53648901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0332_25747001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0332.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0332_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0492.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0332_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0332_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1149.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1419.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback