MD HB338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; requiring the State to provide matching funds to counties for a supplement for each child in a household that receives federally funded benefits under the food supplement program; providing for each eligible child a combined State and county supplement of $30 per month in June, July, and August, and $10 in December; requiring a county to submit a certain application by December 1 to receive certain funding; specifying the required State and local shares of funding; etc.
Title
Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-21) (Y: 119 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-21) (Y: 119 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635 |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-21) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {244964/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Children
Counties
Federal Government
Food Stamps
Governor
Human Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Sunset
Time
Appropriations
Children
Counties
Federal Government
Food Stamps
Governor
Human Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Sunset
Time