MD HB343 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the June 30, 2019, termination date for a provision of law that increased from $250 to $500 the civil penalty for a violation recorded by a school bus monitoring camera for failure to stop for a school vehicle operating alternately flashing red lights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2019-03-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-28HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback