MD HB347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the 5300 block of Belair Road to the locations in which the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City may issue a Class B-D-7 license.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of