MD HB349 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a special charter boat license issued by the Department of Natural Resources is valid for all individuals on a single vessel operated by a certain licensed fishing guide and for certain individuals on a vessel under the guidance of a certain licensed fishing guide in tidal waters of the State.
Title
Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] |
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Andrew Cassilly [R] | Del. Sara Love [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {910518/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Boats and Ships
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Pilots and Docking Masters
Prices
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sports and Recreation
Boats and Ships
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Commerce and Business
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Pilots and Docking Masters
Prices
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sports and Recreation