MD HB349 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-16)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-16)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application requirements for a service member, veteran, or military spouse to apply for an occupational or professional license from a unit in the Maryland Department of Labor to require submission of proof that the applicant has held a license in good standing from another state for at least 1 year; authorizing the issuance of a temporary license to certain individuals who have held a valid license from another state for less than 1 year provided that the license is in good standing; etc.
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 176 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443190/1 Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB280 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 177
Subjects
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Ethics
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Spouses
Time
Veterans
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Ethics
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Spouses
Time
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 5 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |