MD HB358 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to borrow not more than $30,000,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in St. Mary's County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180 |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County