MD HB36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing the juvenile court to impose certain civil fines against a child found to have committed certain violations; repealing a certain provision of law authorizing the juvenile court to impose certain court costs against a juvenile respondent or the respondent's parent, guardian, or custodian under certain circumstances; repealing a certain provision of law authorizing the juvenile court to assess any party or parent of a child in a certain proceeding for services of a certain attorney; etc.
Title
Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-21) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-09-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Judgments
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Legal Aid
Parents and Guardians
Support of Dependents
Attorneys' Fees
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Judgments
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Legal Aid
Parents and Guardians
Support of Dependents
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |