MD HB364 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that each hospital or nursing facility in the State ensure that all of its health care service providers whether in the hospital, outside or in a separate nursing facility wear personal identification tag indicating in readable text the first name, nickname, last name, or full name of the individual that is commonly used in the hospital or nursing facility; specifying the form of names required to be displayed on the badge required to worn by a health care practitioner when providing certain care to a patient; etc.
Title
Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 182 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-22 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Communications
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Identification
Labeling
Names
Nursing Homes
Public Health
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Identification
Labeling
Names
Nursing Homes
Public Health
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 308.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |