MD HB365 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment to 30 times the State minimum hourly wage in effect at the time the wages are due, multiplied by the number of weeks during which the wages due were earned; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 183 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-42) |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {683497/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB425 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 184
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Debt Collection
Exemptions
Insurance
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Debt Collection
Exemptions
Insurance
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 15 | 601.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |