MD HB378 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Comptroller to disburse money from the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund for the reimbursement of specified money paid by a landowner to the Fund for a specified release of a specified lot in accordance with specified requirements; and authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, subject to specified approval and in accordance with specified regulations, to reimburse specified money paid into the Fund under specified circumstances.
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {370215/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |