MD HB378 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the eligibility of qualifying biomass as a Tier 1 renewable source for the purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard to qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or after January 1, 2005, and that achieves a total system efficiency of 65% or more; defining specified terms; altering specified terms; etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2015-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Appropriations
Energy Matters
Grants
Power Plants
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Alternative Energy Sources
Appropriations
Energy Matters
Grants
Power Plants
Utilities
Utility Regulation