MD HB378 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before May 1 of each year, the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to provide to the Comptroller information identifying specified residential property owners who failed to claim the homeowners' property tax credit; requiring the Comptroller to cooperate with and assist the Department in auditing credit applications and to provide specified information to the Department; requiring the Department to contact specified individuals to inform them they may be eligible for the property tax credit; etc.
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness Campaign
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668 |
2016-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-5) |
2016-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senators DeGrange, Ferguson, and Edwards |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2016-04-06 | House | Delegates A. Washington, D. Barnes, and Simonaire |
2016-04-06 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-06 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2016-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {709235/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-5) |
2016-03-11 | House | Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Holmes) Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Comptroller
Notices
Postal Service
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Comptroller
Notices
Postal Service
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property