MD HB378 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, on or after July 1, 2018, the State Department of Education from collecting the Social Security numbers of current, former, or prospective students.
Title
State Department of Education - Social Security Numbers of Students
Sponsors
Del. David Vogt [R] | Sen. William Folden [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Edith Patterson [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {875161/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Social Security
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Social Security
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students